NC H590 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Interior Design Profession Act
Title
Interior Design Profession Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - A2 Hardister Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - A1 Arp M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 85 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - A2 Hardister Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - A1 Arp Second Reading (Y: 34 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - A1 Arp M4 Previous Question Second Reading (Y: 60 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-01 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-06-01 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-05-17 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-05-17 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Finance |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Filed |