NC H585 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-05 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
PREA Compliance
Title
PREA Compliance
Sponsors
Rep. David Lewis [R] | Rep. Marilyn Avila [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. James Fulghum [R] |
Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Nathan Ramsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - A1 Lewis Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-08 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-07 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-05-02 | House | Postponed To 05/07/2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2013 |
2013-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-04-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-08 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | Filed |