NC H563 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate Hemp-Derived Consumables & Kratom
Title
Regulate Hemp-Derived Consumables & Kratom
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-09-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-09-22 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-09-22 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-09-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-09-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-09-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-09-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-09-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 3 |
2023-08-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-08-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-07-12 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-07-12 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-06-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2023-06-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-04-05 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-05 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary 2, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Abc Comn.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Agriculture
Agriculture Board
Agriculture Dept.
Alcoholic Beverages
Ale
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Buildings
Cash Crops
Commerce
Commissions
Controlled Substances
Education
Emergency Services
Fees
Fines & Penalties
Foods & Beverages
Hemp & Hemp Products
Id Systems
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Manufacturing
Minors
Pilot Programs
Property-local Government
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Retailing
Revenue Dept.
School Buildings & Property
Studies
Taxation
Textiles
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Agriculture
Agriculture Board
Agriculture Dept.
Alcoholic Beverages
Ale
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Buildings
Cash Crops
Commerce
Commissions
Controlled Substances
Education
Emergency Services
Fees
Fines & Penalties
Foods & Beverages
Hemp & Hemp Products
Id Systems
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Manufacturing
Minors
Pilot Programs
Property-local Government
Public
Public Safety Dept.
Retailing
Revenue Dept.
School Buildings & Property
Studies
Taxation
Textiles
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 150.12C | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 218.75 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 238.66 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 407.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 239.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18B | 500 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 100 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 101 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 102 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 103 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 104 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 106 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 200 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 201 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 202 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 203 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 204 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 205 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 206 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 300 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 301 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 302 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 303 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 304 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 305 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 400 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
18D | 401 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
7A | 304 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
90 | 94.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |