NC H562 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Summary
Honor Jack Lucas.
Title
Honor Jack Lucas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-20 | Placed On Cal For 5/21/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-20 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-12 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-03-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H562 |