NC H548 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Duty to Report Giglio Information
Title
Duty to Report Giglio Information
Sponsors
Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Kristin Baker [R] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] | Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Marcia Morey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary 2, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Cje & Training Standards Comn.
Commissions
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Discrimination
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Notification
Public
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Witnesses
Commissions
Courts
Criminal Procedure
Discrimination
Evidence
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Notification
Public
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Witnesses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17C | 16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
17E | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
17E | 16 | (n/a) | Citation Text |