NC H548 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Ch. SL 2017-139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Equalize Treatment of Wastewater Products
Title
Equalize Treatment of Wastewater Products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - A1 Warren Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - A1 Warren Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Ch. SL 2017-139 | |
2017-07-20 | Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017 | |
2017-06-27 | Ratified | |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017 |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-05-31 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-05-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-05-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-05-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-04 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S610 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate