NC H53 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Ch. SL 2021-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Ch. SL 2021-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Educ. Changes for Military-Connected Students
Title
Educ. Changes for Military-Connected Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Ch. SL 2021-9 | |
2021-04-09 | Signed by Gov. 4/9/2021 | |
2021-04-05 | Pres. To Gov. 4/5/2021 | |
2021-04-01 | Ratified | |
2021-03-31 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-03-31 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-03-30 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/11/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-23 | House | Serial Referral To Education - Universities Stricken |
2021-02-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Boards
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Education
Education Boards
Family Issues
Higher Education
Local Government
Presented
Private Schools
Public
Ratified
Secondary Education
Students
Unc
Boards
Chaptered
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Education
Education Boards
Family Issues
Higher Education
Local Government
Presented
Private Schools
Public
Ratified
Secondary Education
Students
Unc
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 366 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
116 | 143.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
116 | 281 | (n/a) | Citation Text |