NC H53 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Passed on April 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-06 - Ch. Res 2009-7
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Passed on April 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-06 - Ch. Res 2009-7
Summary
Honor John Brown.
Title
Honor John Brown.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | Ch. Res 2009-7 | |
2009-04-06 | Ratified | |
2009-04-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Placed On Cal For 4/2/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Placed On Cal For 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-05 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-05 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H53 |