NC H529 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Utilities/Water and Wastewater Consumption
Title
Utilities/Water and Wastewater Consumption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Ch. SL 2019-88 | |
2019-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019 | |
2019-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-27 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-06-26 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S429 (Same As) 2019-09-18 - Ch. SL 2019-224