NC H529 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
NC Drivers License Restoration Act
Title
NC Drivers License Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Baskerville [D] | Sen. Robert Bryan [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Howard Hunter [D] |
Rep. Ralph Johnson [D] | Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 100 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion 12: Recall from Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - Third Reading (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 98 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion 12: Recall from Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Ch. SL 2015-186 | |
2015-08-05 | Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-07-30 | Pres. To Gov. 7/30/2015 | |
2015-07-29 | Ratified | |
2015-07-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2015-07-27 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/28/2015 |
2015-07-27 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-07-23 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-07-22 | Engrossed | |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-07-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-28 | House | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Returned To House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-23 | House | Recalled From Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Postponed To 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary IV, if favorable, Finance |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |