NC H511 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Vetoed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Game Nights/Nonprofit Fund-Raiser

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Game Nights/Nonprofit Fund-Raiser

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-29 - Senate - Motion 8 To Adopt Conference Report (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 76 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Not Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-10-11HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-28HousePlaced On Cal For 08/30/2017
2017-08-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-24HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2017
2017-08-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-22HousePlaced On Cal For 08/24/2017
2017-08-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-08-03HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-07-12 Vetoed 07/12/2017
2017-06-30 Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
2017-06-30 Ratified
2017-06-29HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-29SenateConf Report Adopted
2017-06-29HouseConf Report Adopted
2017-06-29SenateConf Com Reported
2017-06-29SenateConf Com Appointed
2017-06-29HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-29HouseConf Com Reported
2017-06-29HouseConf Com Appointed
2017-06-29HouseFail Concur In S Amend SA1
2017-06-28HousePlaced On Cal For 06/29/2017
2017-06-28HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-28HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2017-06-28SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2017-06-28SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-28SenateAmend Adopted A1
2017-06-27SenateReptd Fav
2017-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-21SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-06-21SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-06-21SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-06-20SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-06-08SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-06-08SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-06-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-06-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/07/2017
2017-06-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-05-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-05-26HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-05-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-05-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2017-04-24HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-04-24HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-19HouseRe-ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance
2017-04-19HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-29HouseRef to the Com on Alcoholic Beverage Control, if favorable, Judiciary III
2017-03-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-28HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H511&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H511v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=582
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=583
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=418
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=419
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=854
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=883
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=504

Bill Comments

feedback