NC H5 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Fuquay-Varina/Clemmons Deannexations
Title
Fuquay-Varina/Clemmons Deannexations
Sponsors
Rep. Erin Pare [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Conference Rpt Second Reading For Adoption (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l M11 Not Concur (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/20/2024 |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2024 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2024 |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/30/2024 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/16/2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/09/2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 11/29/2023 |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/25/2023 |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/12/2023 |
2023-10-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/26/2023 |
2023-09-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-09-21 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-09-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-09-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-09-21 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/22/2023 |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/21/2023 |
2023-09-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-09-18 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/20/2023 |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/19/2023 |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Conf Report Passed 2nd |
2023-09-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/19/2023 |
2023-09-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2023-09-12 | House | Ruled Material |
2023-09-12 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/13/2023 |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Held As Material |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-08-14 | House | Conferees Reappointed |
2023-08-14 | House | Conf Com Dismissed |
2023-07-12 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2023-07-12 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2023-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/12/2023 |
2023-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2023-06-29 | House | Ruled Material |
2023-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/07/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2023-03-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-02-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/01/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-02-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-14 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-02-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-01-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-01-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Annexation
Archdale
Asheville
Boards
Boiling Spring Lakes
Brunswick County
Buncombe County
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Extraterritoriality
Flat Rock
Fletcher
Franklin County
Fuquay-varina
Geographic Boundaries
Geography
Granville County
Greensboro
Guilford County
Henderson County
Hendersonville
High Point
Hotels & Motels
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Mayors
Mecklenburg County
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Occupancy
Parking & Parking Structures
Planning & Zoning
Political Activity
Political Parties
Public Officials
Randolph County
Redistricting
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Summerfield
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Title Change
Travel & Tourism
Archdale
Asheville
Boards
Boiling Spring Lakes
Brunswick County
Buncombe County
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Extraterritoriality
Flat Rock
Fletcher
Franklin County
Fuquay-varina
Geographic Boundaries
Geography
Granville County
Greensboro
Guilford County
Henderson County
Hendersonville
High Point
Hotels & Motels
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Mayors
Mecklenburg County
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Occupancy
Parking & Parking Structures
Planning & Zoning
Political Activity
Political Parties
Public Officials
Randolph County
Redistricting
Secondary Education
Session Laws
Summerfield
Tax Distribution
Taxation
Taxes
Title Change
Travel & Tourism