NC H484 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Ch. SL 2023-95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-10 - Ch. SL 2023-95
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health Confidential Info. Disclosure
Title
Mental Health Confidential Info. Disclosure
Sponsors
Rep. Hugh Blackwell [R] | Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] | Rep. Kristin Baker [R] | Rep. Kevin Crutchfield [R] |
Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Howard Penny [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-10 | Ch. SL 2023-95 | |
2023-07-10 | Signed by Gov. 7/10/2023 | |
2023-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2023 | |
2023-07-03 | Ratified | |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Chaptered
Confidentiality
Dhhs
Health Services
Medical Records
Mental Health
Patient Rights
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Records
Administrative Rules
Chaptered
Confidentiality
Dhhs
Health Services
Medical Records
Mental Health
Patient Rights
Presented
Privacy
Public
Public Health
Ratified
Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
122C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
122C | 53 | (n/a) | Citation Text |