NC H479 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Auto Salvage Dealer Protection Act
Title
Auto Salvage Dealer Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Michael Speciale [R] | Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Jason Saine [R] |
Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] | Rep. Samuel Watford [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary II. If fav, re-ref to Commerce |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-28 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/27/2015 |
2015-04-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-04-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Filed |