NC H458 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary II
Pending: Senate Judiciary II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Public Hospital Conveyances
Title
Public Hospital Conveyances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Health Care Added |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/14/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-05-14 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2013-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2013-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-04-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S372 (Same As) 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-340