NC H457 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-12 - Ch. SL 2012-167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal Electric Utilities/Rate Hearings
Title
Municipal Electric Utilities/Rate Hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - House - M11 Concur\S. Amd. 1 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-12 | Ch. SL 2012-167 | |
2012-07-12 | Signed By Gov. 7/12/2012 | |
2012-07-03 | Pres. To Gov. 7/3/2012 | |
2012-07-02 | Ratified | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-07-02 | Concurred In S Amend | |
2012-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/2/2012 | |
2012-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur In S Amend 1 | |
2012-06-29 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-28 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-28 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2012-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2012 | |
2012-06-28 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-28 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-24 | Ref To Com On Public Utilities | |
2011-03-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-23 | Filed |