NC H455 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Ch. SL 2023-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Ch. SL 2023-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expedite Water/Wastewater Franchise Transfer
Title
Expedite Water/Wastewater Franchise Transfer
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. Jake Johnson [R] | Rep. Matthew Winslow [R] | Rep. Larry Strickland [R] |
Rep. Bill Ward [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Ch. SL 2023-67 | |
2023-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2023 | |
2023-06-22 | Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2023 | |
2023-06-21 | Ratified | |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Commissions
Infrastructure
Presented
Public
Ratified
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Water & Sewer Systems
Commerce
Commissions
Infrastructure
Presented
Public
Ratified
Utilities
Utilities Comn.
Water & Sewer Systems
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
62 | 111 | (n/a) | Citation Text |