NC H449 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Certain Beach Towns/Navigable Waters
Title
Certain Beach Towns/Navigable Waters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
160A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
160A | 205.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |