NC H440 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-22 - Ch. SL 2009-147
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Passed on June 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-22 - Ch. SL 2009-147
Summary
The Nicholas Adkins School Bus Safety Act.
Title
The Nicholas Adkins School Bus Safety Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-22 | Ch. SL 2009-147 | |
2009-06-22 | Signed By Gov. 6/22/2009 | |
2009-06-12 | Pres. To Gov. 6/12/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Ratified | |
2009-06-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-09 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-04 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/4/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-27 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-05-27 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-09 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Postponed To 4/7/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed On Cal For 4/6/2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-09 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H440 |