NC H438 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Education
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Education
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Campus Police/Private IHE/CC Waiver
Title
Campus Police/Private IHE/CC Waiver
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. MaryAnne Black [D] | Rep. Edward Goodwin [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. John Sauls [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Education |
2019-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Universities |
2019-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Education - Universities, if favorable, Appropriations, Education, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H438 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H438v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H438v1.pdf |