NC H436 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Ch. SL 2016-60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unauthorized Practice of Law Changes
Title
Unauthorized Practice of Law Changes
Sponsors
Rep. Leo Daughtry [R] | Sen. Robert Bryan [R] | Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Schaffer [R] |
Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - A2 Howard Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - A2 Howard Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Ch. SL 2016-60 | |
2016-06-30 | Signed by Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2016 | |
2016-06-20 | Ratified | |
2016-06-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-16 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-15 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-15 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/16/2016 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-05-11 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-05-11 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-05-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-05-11 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-09-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-09-24 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-09-24 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-21 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-20 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-20 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-04-20 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary I |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |