NC H43 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Parking Meters
Title
Winston-Salem/Parking Meters
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Edward Hanes [D] | Rep. Evelyn Terry [D] |
Rep. Larry Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-03-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/10/2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-02-05 | House | Ref To Com On Local Government |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S8 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate