NC H424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Superseding Domestic Orders
Title
Superseding Domestic Orders
Sponsors
Rep. William Richardson [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Mary Belk [D] | Rep. Robert Reives [D] |
Rep. Bobbie Richardson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - A1 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - A1 Richardson, W. Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-19 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary IV, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |