NC H424 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Ch. SL 2016-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit Unlawful Custody Transfer of Child
Title
Prohibit Unlawful Custody Transfer of Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | Ch. SL 2016-115 | |
2016-07-28 | Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-24 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-09 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-09 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-06-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/09/2015 |
2015-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-04 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-04-15 | House | Rule 38 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-01 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary III |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Filed |