NC H413 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Funds to Support Greensboro/US Figure Skating
Title
Funds to Support Greensboro/US Figure Skating
Sponsors
Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. Amos Quick [D] | Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, General Government |
2019-05-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Appropriations, General Government, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H413 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H413v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H413v1.pdf |