NC H411 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Ch. SL 2023-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Ch. SL 2023-9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
General Assembly Appointments
Title
General Assembly Appointments
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Ch. SL 2023-9 | |
2023-03-30 | Ratified | |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Select Committee on Nominations |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-20 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-16 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Acupuncture; Acupuncture Licensing Board; Appointments; Armed Forces; Attorneys; Authorities; Banking Comn.; Banks; Barbers & Cosmetologists; Boards; Child Care Comn.; Cje & Training Standards Comn.; Commerce; Commissions; Compacts; Corporations
Nonprofit; Councils; Courts; Crimes; Cultural Resources; Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.; Day Care; Disciplinary Hearing Comn.; Domestic Violence; Domestic Violence Comn.; Education; Emergency Services; Ethics; Financial Institutions; Fisheries Product
Nonprofit; Councils; Courts; Crimes; Cultural Resources; Natural & Cultural Resources Dept.; Day Care; Disciplinary Hearing Comn.; Domestic Violence; Domestic Violence Comn.; Education; Emergency Services; Ethics; Financial Institutions; Fisheries Product