NC H386 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sunny Point Rail ROW Firearm Discharge Ban
Title
Sunny Point Rail ROW Firearm Discharge Ban
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Ch. SL 2021-43 | |
2021-06-16 | Ratified | |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Animals
Armed Forces
Brunswick County
Chaptered
Counties
Crimes
Fines & Penalties
Fish & Wildlife
Hunting & Fishing
Infrastructure
Local
Railroads
Ratified
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Title Change
Transportation
Weapons
Armed Forces
Brunswick County
Chaptered
Counties
Crimes
Fines & Penalties
Fish & Wildlife
Hunting & Fishing
Infrastructure
Local
Railroads
Ratified
Roads & Highways
Session Laws
Title Change
Transportation
Weapons