NC H38 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Ch. SL 2021-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Ch. SL 2021-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Bd. of Trustees/Isothermal CC
Title
Bd. of Trustees/Isothermal CC
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Ch. SL 2021-52 | |
2021-06-23 | Ratified | |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-02-17 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 02/17/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-02-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-11 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S128 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Boards
Chaptered
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Counties
County Commissioners
Local
Local Government
Membership
Public Officials
Ratified
Rutherford County
Session Laws
Chaptered
Community College Boards
Community Colleges
Counties
County Commissioners
Local
Local Government
Membership
Public Officials
Ratified
Rutherford County
Session Laws
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115D | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text |