NC H38 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-27 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Tax Certification - Alamance County
Title
Tax Certification - Alamance County
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Bordsen [D] | Rep. Dan Ingle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-27 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-07-27 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-02-07 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-02-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S29 (Same As) 2011-04-12 - Ch. SL 2011-33