NC H377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Reduce Testing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reduce Testing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-01HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-19HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-18HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback