NC H374 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs
Pending: House Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Summary
Improve Upper Neuse Basin Water Quality.
Title
Improve Upper Neuse Basin Water Quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-06 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-11 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-11 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-10 | Re-ref Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-10 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-04 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-03-04 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S345 (Same As) 2011-06-13 - Re-ref Com On Finance
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H374 |