NC H372 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-23 - Ch. SL 2015-245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-23 - Ch. SL 2015-245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid Transformation and Reorganization
Title
Medicaid Transformation and Reorganization
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Donny Lambeth [R] | Rep. Brian Brown [R] | Rep. Bert Jones [R] |
Rep. Joshua Dobson [R] | Rep. Larry Pittman [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] | Rep. James Whitmire [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-22 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 65 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-11 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-08-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-23 | Ch. SL 2015-245 | |
2015-09-23 | Signed by Gov. 9/23/2015 | |
2015-09-22 | Pres. To Gov. 9/22/2015 | |
2015-09-22 | Ratified | |
2015-09-22 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-22 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/22/2015 |
2015-09-17 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 09/22/2015 |
2015-09-17 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-08-24 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Conferees Changed |
2015-08-20 | House | Conferees Changed |
2015-08-19 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-08-19 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-08-19 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-08-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/19/2015 |
2015-08-13 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2015-08-12 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-08-12 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-08-11 | Engrossed | |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-08-11 | Senate | Amend Failed A2 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Health Care |
2015-08-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Ways & Means |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-24 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-06-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2015-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S574 (Same As) 2015-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate