NC H367 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Ch. SL 2011-158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Roanoke Rapids Deannexation
Title
Roanoke Rapids Deannexation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Ch. SL 2011-158 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-14 | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2011-06-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-08 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-08 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-05-24 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-24 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-05-18 | Placed On Cal For 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-21 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-04-21 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-16 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S313 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate