NC H366 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Regulatory Reform Act of 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Reform Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-22SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-22SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-04-22HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-04-21HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-20HousePlaced On Cal For 04/21/2021
2021-04-20HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-04-20HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-03-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-25HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-24HouseRef to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-23HouseFiled

Subjects

Abc Comn.
Admin. Procedure Oversight Comm.
Administrative Rules
Advertising & Marketing
Alcoholic Beverages
Budgeting
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Commerce
Commissions
Committees
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Council Of State
Court Costs & Fees
Courts
Deq
Deregulation
Dhhs
Disasters & Emergencies
Distilleries
Early Childhood Education
Education
Electronic Commerce
Elementary Education
Emergency Management
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Environment
Fees
Firefighters & Firefighting
Funding
General Assembly
Government Employees
Health Depts.
Health Services
Housing
Information Technology
Infrastructure
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Internet
Kindergarten
Landlord & Tenant
Law Enforcement
Licenses & Permits
Liquor
Local Government
Local Government Employees
Local Ordinances
Manufactured Homes
Manufacturing
Minors
Municipalities
Notification
Personnel
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Public Officials
Public Safety Dept.
Real Estate
Rentals & Leasing
Reports
Rescue Squads
Retailing
Revenue Laws Study Comm.
Rules Objection Filed
Signs
Studies
Taxation
Taxes
Teleservices
Transportation
Transportation Dept.
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14(n/a)See Bill Text
14234(n/a)See Bill Text
143215.1(n/a)See Bill Text
150B21.1(n/a)See Bill Text
159G(n/a)See Bill Text
159G23(n/a)See Bill Text
160D(n/a)See Bill Text
160D910(n/a)See Bill Text
18B(n/a)See Bill Text
18B1001(n/a)See Bill Text
18B1105(n/a)See Bill Text
18B800(n/a)See Bill Text
42(n/a)See Bill Text
4214.5(n/a)See Bill Text
4239(n/a)See Bill Text
4246(n/a)See Bill Text
58(n/a)See Bill Text
5841-15(n/a)See Bill Text
72(n/a)See Bill Text
721(n/a)See Bill Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H366
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H366v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H366v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H366v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H366v3.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/1874/0/H366-PCS10192-BR-6
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50392/0/H366-PCS40382-BR-10
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H366-SMBR-21(CSBR-6)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H366-SMBR-29(CSBR-10)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H366-SMBR-33(e3)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/117

Bill Comments 750

feedback