NC H325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Arson Law
Title
Amend Arson Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Ch. SL 2018-31 | |
2018-06-22 | Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-14 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-14 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-25 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary II, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed |