NC H310 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Insurance Prod'r Crim. Bckgrd Check
Title
Clarify Insurance Prod'r Crim. Bckgrd Check
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia McElraft [R] | Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] | Rep. William Richardson [D] | Rep. Garland Pierce [D] |
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Lawrence Yarborough [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Ch. SL 2019-85 | |
2019-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2019 | |
2019-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2019 | |
2019-06-27 | Ratified | |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-26 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-15 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-11 | House | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S365 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate