NC H310 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Ch. SL 2017-159
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wireless Communications Infrastructure Siting
Title
Wireless Communications Infrastructure Siting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - A2 Harrison Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - A1 Stone Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - A2 Harrison Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 83 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - A1 Stone Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Ch. SL 2017-159 | |
2017-07-21 | Signed by Gov. 7/21/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Insurance |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-01 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-01 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/30/2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-24 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2017-05-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-05-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-13 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S377 (Same As) 2017-03-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate