NC H308 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Regulatory Reform Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory Reform Act of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Ch. SL 2020-74
2020-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
2020-06-25 Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020
2020-06-25 Ratified
2020-06-25HouseOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-25SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-25SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-25HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-23SenateConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseConf Com Appointed
2020-06-23HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2020-06-22HousePlaced On Cal For 06/23/2020
2020-06-22HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2020-06-22HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2020-06-22SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2020-06-22SenateEngrossed
2020-06-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2020-06-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2020-06-22SenateAmend Adopted A1
2020-06-19SenateReptd Fav
2020-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-18SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-18SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-17SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2020-06-17SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2020-06-17SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2020-06-16SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2020-06-15SenateRe-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2020-06-15SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-04SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-04SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-04HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-03HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-28HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-28HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-20HouseRe-ref Com On Regulatory Reform
2019-03-20HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-11HouseRef to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-11HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-07HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H308
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H308v7.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/121
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/797
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/796
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/990
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/864
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1043

Bill Comments

feedback