NC H307 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-10-04 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Board Cert. Behavior Analyst/Autism Coverage

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board Cert. Behavior Analyst/Autism Coverage

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-04SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-10-04SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-19HousePlaced On Cal For 04/20/2017
2017-04-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-19HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-22HouseRe-ref Com On Insurance
2017-03-22HouseReptd Fav
2017-03-13HouseRef to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance
2017-03-13HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-09HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback