NC H30 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Ch. SL 2021-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Ch. SL 2021-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Town of Southern Shores/Eminent Domain
Title
Town of Southern Shores/Eminent Domain
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Ch. SL 2021-14 | |
2021-04-27 | Ratified | |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-03-18 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/17/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2021-03-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-02-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-01-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S71 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Beach Erosion
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Counties
Dare County
Disasters & Emergencies
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Eminent Domain
Erosion
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Property
Ratified
Southern Shores
Chaptered
Coastal Resources
Counties
Dare County
Disasters & Emergencies
Emergency Management
Emergency Services
Eminent Domain
Erosion
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Property
Ratified
Southern Shores
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40A | 3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
40A | 42 | (n/a) | Citation Text |