NC H30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - Ch. SL 2017-114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Special Registration Plates
Title
Various Special Registration Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | Ch. SL 2017-114 | |
2017-07-18 | Signed by Gov. 7/18/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-29 | Ratified | |
2017-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-29 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-06-08 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2017 |
2017-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2017-02-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed |