NC H272 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-8)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Ch. SL 2021-69
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revise Health Standard for Lead
Title
Revise Health Standard for Lead
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Ch. SL 2021-69 | |
2021-07-02 | Signed by Gov. 7/2/2021 | |
2021-06-23 | Pres. To Gov. 6/23/2021 | |
2021-06-22 | Ratified | |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/21/2021 |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Health |
2021-04-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-15 | House | Ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Chaptered
Commissions
Environment
Environmental Health
Hazardous Substances
Minors
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Ratified
Testing
Water Resources
Administrative Rules
Chaptered
Commissions
Environment
Environmental Health
Hazardous Substances
Minors
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Ratified
Testing
Water Resources
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
130A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
130A | 131.7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 131.9C | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
130A | 313 | (n/a) | Citation Text |