NC H272 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-29 - Ch. SL 2015-254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on September 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-29 - Ch. SL 2015-254
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appointments Bill 2015
Title
Appointments Bill 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-28 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-09-28 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-22 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | Ch. SL 2015-254 | |
2015-09-29 | Ratified | |
2015-09-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-28 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-28 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2015-09-28 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2015-09-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/28/2015 |
2015-09-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-24 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2015-09-24 | Engrossed | |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-09-22 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-09-22 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-09-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-09-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-09-22 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-09-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-09-22 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed |