NC H265 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Partisan Elections/Certain School Boards
Title
Partisan Elections/Certain School Boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-ref to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-05 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-03-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Filed |