NC H248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ch. SL 2021-142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Spring Lake Charter Amendment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spring Lake Charter Amendment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09 Ch. SL 2021-142
2021-09-09 Ratified
2021-09-08HouseOrdered Enrolled
2021-09-08HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2021-09-03HousePlaced On Cal For 09/08/2021
2021-09-03HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2021-09-03HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2021-09-02SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2021-09-01SenateEngrossed
2021-09-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-09-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-09-01SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-08-31SenateReptd Fav
2021-08-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-25SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-08-25SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-08-19SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-08-19SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-05-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-12SenateRegular Message Received From House
2021-05-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-05-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-05-11HouseReptd Fav
2021-04-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-10HouseRef to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-09HouseFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/H248
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/House/PDF/H248v6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50725/0/H248-PCS40429-BV-14
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52889/0/H248-PCS40660-RN-28
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52990/0/H248-A-NBC-9160
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H248-SMBV-42(e1)-v-7
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H248-SMBV-67(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H248-SMRN-83(e2)-v-3
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H248-SMRN-84(e3)-v-4
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/H248-SMRN-85(e4)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/434
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/435

Bill Comments 750

feedback