NC H242 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wrightsville Beach Initiative Ordinances
Title
Wrightsville Beach Initiative Ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-02 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Charters
City Councils
Counties
Elections
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Referendum & Initiative
Session Laws
Wrightsville Beach
City Councils
Counties
Elections
Local
Local Government
Local Ordinances
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Referendum & Initiative
Session Laws
Wrightsville Beach