NC H224 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Ch. SL 2017-101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Warrant Check of Inmates in Custody

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Warrant Check of Inmates in Custody

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12 Ch. SL 2017-101
2017-07-12 Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
2017-06-27 Pres. To Gov. 6/27/2017
2017-06-26 Ratified
2017-06-22SenateOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-22SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-21SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/22/2017
2017-06-21SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-19SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/21/2017
2017-06-19SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/19/2017
2017-06-15SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-31SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-23SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-23SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-04-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-04-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-04-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-04-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-04-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-04-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-04-19HousePlaced On Cal For 04/20/2017
2017-04-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-04-19HouseReptd Fav
2017-04-06HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary I
2017-04-06HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-02HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-03-02HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-01HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback