NC H212 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-568
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-568
Summary
Health Insurance Pool Pilot Program.
Title
Health Insurance Pool Pilot Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-568 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Pres. To Gov. 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-06 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Placed On Cal For 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-05 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-05 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-04 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-04 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-31 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-03-31 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Placed On Cal For 3/26/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-16 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-03-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-18 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-02-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H212 |