NC H206 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ch. SL 2011-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Ch. SL 2011-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modify Property Tax Base Exclusions
Title
Modify Property Tax Base Exclusions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Ch. SL 2011-123 | |
2011-06-13 | Signed By Gov. 6/13/2011 | |
2011-06-10 | Pres. To Gov. 6/10/2011 | |
2011-06-09 | Ratified | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-24 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-24 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-19 | Placed On Cal For 5/23/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-03 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-03-03 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S164 (Same As) 2011-03-02 - Ref To Com On Finance