NC H205 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

WC Changes/Legal Notice Modernization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WC Changes/Legal Notice Modernization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 63 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - For Adoption Conference Report (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Not Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-10-11HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-28HousePlaced On Cal For 08/30/2017
2017-08-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-24HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2017
2017-08-24HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-08-22HousePlaced On Cal For 08/24/2017
2017-08-22HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-08-03HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-07-17 Vetoed 07/17/2017
2017-06-29 Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2017
2017-06-29 Ratified
2017-06-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2017-06-28HouseConf Report Adopted
2017-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-28HouseConf Com Reported
2017-06-28SenateConf Report Adopted
2017-06-28SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-28SenateConf Com Reported
2017-06-28SenateConf Com Appointed
2017-06-28HouseConf Com Appointed
2017-06-28HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2017-06-28HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-28HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-27HousePlaced On Cal For 06/29/2017
2017-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-27HousePlaced On Cal For 06/28/2017
2017-06-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-06-27HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-26HousePlaced On Cal For 06/27/2017
2017-06-26HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2017-06-26HouseWithdrawn From Com
2017-06-08HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2017-06-08HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2017-06-07HousePlaced On Cal For 06/08/2017
2017-06-07HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2017-06-07HouseRuled Material
2017-06-06HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2017-06-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2017-06-05SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2017-06-01SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2017-06-01SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2017-06-01SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-31SenateReptd Fav
2017-05-24SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2017-05-24SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2017-05-24SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-05-16SenateRe-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-05-16SenateWithdrawn From Com
2017-03-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2017-03-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2017-03-14SenateRegular Message Received From House
2017-03-09HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2017-03-09HousePassed 3rd Reading
2017-03-09HousePassed 2nd Reading
2017-03-08HousePlaced On Cal For 03/09/2017
2017-03-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2017-03-08HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2017-03-01HouseRef To Com On Judiciary III
2017-03-01HousePassed 1st Reading
2017-02-28HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H205&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H205v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H205v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H205v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H205v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H205v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=80
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=243
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=249
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=809
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=465
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=835

Bill Comments

feedback